Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Szaniszlň de Torda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1792Born
10 Dec 181523.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 181523.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 185058.0SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
17 Feb 185158.5ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
25 May 185158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
4 Jan 186976.4ResignedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
13 Dec 186977.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Szaniszlň de Torda (VIAF: 166937840)
Bishop Ferenc Szaniszlň de Torda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzombathely

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017