Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsigmond DeŠky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1795Born
1819¹23.6Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 Jul 184146.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 Jul 184146.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
24 Aug 184146.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
29 Dec 187277.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zsigmond DeŠky (VIAF: 88798994)
Bishop Zsigmond DeŠky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHimůd, Diocese of Győr (Raab)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Death PlaceGyőr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 124
  • fn/bd: CB, 28 Sep 2016
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1841, Number 35
  • ob: CB, 7 Aug 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,475

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018