Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Karner

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1794Born
11 Aug 181622.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jan 181723.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 184955.7SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
7 Jan 185055.9ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 May 185056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
30 Sep 185662.6DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Anton Karner
Bishop Anton Karner (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSopron

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 317
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017