Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Štefan Moyses

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1797Born
13 Jan 182123.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
14 Jan 182123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
5 Sep 185052.8SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
17 Feb 185153.3ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
25 May 185153.5Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
5 Jul 186971.6DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Štefan Moyses (VIAF: 35286400)
Bishop Štefan Moyses (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeszele, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 408
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 27
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017