Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Viber

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Alia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1795Born
23 Aug 181823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Aug 181823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Jun 185660.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Jun 185660.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
14 Sep 185661.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
15 Jan 186670.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Viber
Bishop József Viber (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017