Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Tóth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1785Born
7 Aug 180923.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
10 Aug 180923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
25 Sep 185771.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
25 Sep 185771.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
1 Nov 185771.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
6 Jan 186579.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Tóth
Bishop Imre Tóth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017