Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ágoston Roskoványi

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1807Born
23 Jan 183022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 185143.3SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Sep 185143.7ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
30 Nov 185143.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
10 Feb 185951.1SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
15 Apr 185951.3ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
24 Feb 189284.2DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ágoston Roskoványi (VIAF: 12654660)
Bishop Ágoston Roskoványi (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzenna
Ordained BishopEger, Archdiocese of Eger, Hungary

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 416, and Page 578
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017