Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vojtech Bartakovics

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1792³BornFelsö-Elefánt
25 Aug 181422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Aug 181523.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 184452.4SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
20 Jan 184552.8ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
8 Jun 184553.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
6 Apr 185058.0SelectedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
30 Sep 185058.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
30 May 187381.1DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vojtech Bartakovics:
Archbishop Vojtech Bartakovics (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 82
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013