Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Lévay

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1808³Born
18 Oct 183325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Oct 183325.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 187263.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
5 Jul 187263.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
20 Aug 187264.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
9 Nov 187365.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Lévay
Bishop Alexander Lévay (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiste, Diocese of Košice, Slovakia
Ordained BishopEger, Archdiocese of Eger

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017