Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Kopácsy

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1775³BornVeszprém
6 Sep 179722.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 179823.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 182146.6SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
19 Apr 182246.9ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
16 Jun 182247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
26 Feb 182549.7SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
27 Jun 182550.1ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
20 Dec 183863.6SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Feb 183963.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Sep 184772.3DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Kopácsy:
Archbishop József Kopácsy (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 64, and Page 395
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,374
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013