Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Miskólczy

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1763³Born
24 Sep 178925.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Sep 178925.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 184076.5SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
14 Dec 184077.0ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
21 Mar 184177.3Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
185288.1DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Martin Miskólczy
Bishop Martin Miskólczy (born , died 1852) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalgócz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018