Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Benyovszky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1756³Born
8 Aug 177922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 177923.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 182063.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
28 Aug 182063.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
5 Nov 182064.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
25 Aug 182770.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Benyovszky
Bishop János Benyovszky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiss-Jeszeniez

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast