Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gábor Balassa

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1783³BornMencshely
2 Sep 180522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Apr 180623.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 184461.0SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
17 Jun 184461.2ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
6 Oct 184461.5Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
11 Aug 185168.3DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gábor Balassa
Bishop Gábor Balassa (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016