Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Sztankovics

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1781³Born
26 Oct 180423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 180423.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 183856.8SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
13 Sep 183857.2ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
28 Oct 183857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
7 Mar 184866.7DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Sztankovics
Bishop János Sztankovics (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLéva, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopCathedral, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2016
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 46
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,050

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018