Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Barkóczy

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1792BornImregh
9 Apr 181422.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jan 181523.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 183745.0SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
19 May 183745.4ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
6 Aug 183745.6Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
13 Dec 184755.9DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Barkóczy:
Bishop László Barkóczy (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013