Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Ocskay

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1795BornBoliarov
7 Sep 181722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Košice, Slovakia
2 Aug 181823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
22 Nov 183843.4SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
18 Feb 183943.7ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
18 Aug 183944.2Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
13 Sep 184853.2DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Anton Ocskay (VIAF: 305599502)
Bishop Anton Ocskay (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 139
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016