Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Rajner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

Titular Bishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1762BornStomfa
15 Aug 178725.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
17 Aug 178725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
27 Apr 184078.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
27 Apr 184078.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amorium
26 Jul 184078.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amorium
1860¹97.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rajner
Bishop Carlo Rajner (born , died 1860) Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016