Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elek Jordánszky

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1761³BornKošice
24 Sep 178928.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Sep 178928.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 183069.0SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
28 Feb 183169.4ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
24 Apr 183169.6Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
17 Feb 184078.4DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elek Jordánszky (VIAF: 20080578)
Bishop Elek Jordánszky (born , died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1840, Page 167
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016