Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Mátyás Szutsits

Deceased

Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1767³BornSzentmária
25 Dec 178923.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Jan 179023.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 182760.4SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
28 Jan 182861.0ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
23 Mar 182861.2Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
14 Jun 183063.4SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
28 Feb 183164.1ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
13 Apr 183467.3DiedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pál Mátyás Szutsits:
Bishop Pál Mátyás Szutsits (born , died ) Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 64, and Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013