Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Barišić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1796BornOčevija, Bosnia and Herzegovina
16 Apr 181821.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Dec 182226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Mar 183235.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia
24 Mar 183235.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
30 Sep 183236.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
5 Dec 183236.4InstalledVicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia
24 Mar 184649.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia
24 Sep 184751.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Herzegovina
14 Aug 186367.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Rafael Barišić:
Bishop Rafael Barišić O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Herzegovina

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1863
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013