Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Perger

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1819BornČertižné
22 Jul 184223.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
26 Jul 184223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
13 Mar 186849.0AppointedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
28 Jun 186849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
5 Apr 187657.1DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Perger:
Bishop Ján Perger (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 189
  • c34: CB, 2 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,733

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013