Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Gaganecz

Deceased

Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1793Born
5 Mar 181723.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
8 Mar 181723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
22 Sep 181825.4IncardinatedPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
2 Aug 184249.3SelectedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
30 Jan 184349.8ConfirmedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
25 Jun 184350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
22 Dec 187582.7DiedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jozef Gaganecz
Bishop Jozef Gaganecz (born , died ) Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVyshnyj Tvarosch

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,438
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017