Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Pankovics

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1820Born
24 Aug 185130.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Aug 185130.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 186646.1SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
22 Feb 186746.3ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
5 May 186746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
29 Aug 187453.8DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for István Pankovics (VIAF: 251340223)
Bishop István Pankovics (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelejte, Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)
Ordained BishopPrešov, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 396
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017