Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filoteo Zassi, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1654BornMezzoiuso
26 Jan 167016.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 May 169642.3AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
Feb 1700²46.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
26 Jul 172672.5DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filoteo Zassi:
Archbishop Filoteo Zassi O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,856
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015