Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Arcadio Stanila

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia

Titular See: Colonia? (Musacchia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637²Born
2 Mar 165922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Jun 166023.4Ordained PriestPriest
1661¹24.0Ordained BishopBishop
1685¹48.0ResignedBishop
9 Sep 169760.6DiedTitular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Arcadio Stanila
Bishop Andrea Arcadio Stanila (born 1637, died ) Titular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrete, Archdiocese of Candia {Crete}, Greece

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast