Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)

Archidioecesis Presoviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ján Babjak, S.J., Archbishop
  • Milan Lach, S.J., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)
22 September 1818ErectedEparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian) Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian) (erected)
18 January 1996Territory LostEparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian) Apostolic Exarchate of Czech Republic (Ruthenian) (erected)
27 January 1997Territory LostEparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian) Apostolic Exarchate of Košice (Slovakian) (erected)
30 January 2008Territory LostEparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian) Eparchy of Bratislava (Slovakian) (erected)
Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)
30 January 2008ElevatedEparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian) Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)
1949320,96912,337,6842.6%311303419414339241ap1951
1970350,00014,000,0002.5%201ap1971
1980350,000217182351,4892778200ap1981
1990361,992194202141,6912876201ap1991
1999118,740230212514732569179ap2000
2000175,00022720247708133104199ap2001
2001175,0002412226366514176200ap2002
2002135,8292272224954514085201ap2003
2003136,2792321925154213786201ap2004
2004136,593221222435622480201ap2005
Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)
2009137,5002321724955212176161ap2010
2012123,7002472226945912598164ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Apr 2014