Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Ljavinec

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Acalissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1923BornVolovec
28 Jul 194623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
18 Jan 199672.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
18 Jan 199672.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
30 Mar 199672.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
23 Apr 200380.0RetiredApostolic Exarch of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
9 Dec 201289.6DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)

MicroData Summary for Ivan Ljavinec:
Bishop Ivan Ljavinec (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Czech Republic

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,701
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,513
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015