Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Coppa

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Czech Republic

Cardinal-Deacon of San Lino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1925BornAlba, Italy
2 Jan 194923.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 197954.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serta
1 Dec 197954.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
6 Jan 198054.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serta
30 Jun 199064.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czechoslovakia
1 Jan 199367.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic
1 Jan 199367.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia
2 Mar 199468.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia
19 May 200175.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic
24 Nov 200782.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lino
24 Nov 200782.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 200882.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Lino
16 May 201690.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Coppa
Giovanni Cardinal Coppa (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Czech Republic

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2008
  • d: CB, 17 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016