Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Rábek

Bishop of Slovakia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1949 BornSládeckovce
7 Jun 197223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
13 Jul 199142.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
13 Jul 199142.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Catrum
27 Jul 199142.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catrum
20 Jan 200353.9AppointedBishop of Slovakia, Military

MicroData Summary for František Rábek:
Bishop František Rábek (born ) Bishop of Slovakia, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Slovakia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013