Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bratislava

Archidioecesis Bratislaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanislav Zvolenský, Archbishop
  • Jozef Hal’ko, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Dominik Tóth, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Štefan Vrablec, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 14 February 2008
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovakia
  • Square Kilometers: 3,759 (1,451 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://abu-bratislava.sk/
  • Mailing Address: Arcibiskupsky urad, Spitalska 7, SK-814 92 Bratislava, Slovenska Republika
  • Telephone: (02)572.00.611
  • Fax: 572.00.612

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Trnava
29 May 1922ErectedArchdiocese of Esztergom Apostolic Administration of Trnava (erected)
Archdiocese of Trnava
30 December 1977ElevatedApostolic Administration of Trnava Archdiocese of Trnava
Archdiocese of Bratislava-Trnava
31 March 1995Name ChangedArchdiocese of Trnava Archdiocese of Bratislava-Trnava
14 February 2008Territory LostArchdiocese of Bratislava-Trnava Diocese of Nitra
Archdiocese of Bratislava
14 February 2008SplitArchdiocese of Bratislava-Trnava Archdiocese of Bratislava
Archdiocese of Trnava

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Administration of Trnava
19491,110,0001,372,00080.9%5631807431,4933081,389422ap1951
19691,545,0001,800,00085.8%4031905932,6052751,186435ap1971
Archdiocese of Trnava
19801,406,8101,763,20979.8%4301005302,654128710449ap1981
19901,300,9111,987,40065.5%379504293,03260547435ap1991
Archdiocese of Bratislava-Trnava
19991,188,9111,916,16362.0%4212436641,79014451,073446ap2000
20001,187,2351,914,48762.0%4242376611,79623971,063445ap2001
20011,185,4531,912,70562.0%4253387631,55365241,141446ap2002
2002144,0132,087,0596.9%42828471220274931,120448ap2003
20031,350,3261,905,14870.9%4432647071,90954641,123447ap2004
20041,348,1521,932,51669.8%4402867261,85674711,371447ap2005
20061,349,7571,927,87870.0%4852787631,7695466968449ap2007
Archdiocese of Bratislava
2008405,281506,68680.0%106921982,0464208323180ap2009
2012486,373795,64961.1%1691823511,3854335560122ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013