Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Hal’ko

Auxiliary Bishop of Bratislava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1964 Born
4 Jul 199430.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
31 Jan 201247.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava, Slovakia
31 Jan 201247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Serra
17 Mar 201247.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serra

MicroData Summary for Jozef Hal’ko (VIAF: 4638712)
Bishop Jozef Hal’ko (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bratislava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBratislava

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bratislava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • ob: CB, 31 Jan 2012
  • c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast