Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Giordana

Apostolic Nuncio to Slovakia

Titular Archbishop of Minora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1942 BornBarge, Italy
25 Jun 196725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Apr 200462.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Minora
27 Apr 200462.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
29 May 200462.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Minora
15 Mar 200866.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Mario Giordana:
Archbishop Mario Giordana (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Slovakia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Slovakia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,601
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013