Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Guerrini

Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1941 Born
28 Jun 196422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuneo, Italy
16 Apr 200361.6AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
1 Jun 200361.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 Dec 201675.2RetiredBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Guerrini (VIAF: 161567422)
Bishop Giuseppe Guerrini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saluzzo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,403
  • bd: CB, 15 Sep 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2016
  • loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast