Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Natale Bona

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1926Born
8 Oct 195023.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 198558.9AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
1 Dec 198558.9Ordained BishopBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
17 Jan 199467.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
16 Apr 200376.3RetiredBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Apr 201790.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Natale Bona
Bishop Diego Natale Bona (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione Tinella
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 29 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Apr 2017