Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristiano Bodo

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1968 Born
29 May 199324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vercelli, Italy
17 Dec 201648.3AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
25 Mar 201748.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
2 Apr 201748.6InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristiano Bodo
Bishop Cristiano Bodo (born ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saluzzo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast