Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Róbert Bezák, C.SS.R.

Archbishop Emeritus of Trnava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1960 BornPrievidza
197918.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
198322.8Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jun 198424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Apr 200949.1AppointedArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia
6 Jun 200949.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia
2 Jul 201252.3RemovedArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Róbert Bezák:
Archbishop Róbert Bezák C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trnava

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trnava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,185
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013