Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislav Zvolenský

Archbishop of Bratislava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1958 BornTrnava
13 Jun 198223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
2 Apr 200445.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
2 Apr 200445.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
2 May 200445.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
14 Feb 200849.2AppointedArchbishop of Bratislava, Slovakia
8 Mar 200849.3InstalledArchbishop of Bratislava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Zvolenský:
Archbishop Stanislav Zvolenský (born ) Archbishop of Bratislava

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bratislava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013