Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vladimír Fekete, S.D.B.

Prefect of Azerbaijan

Titular Bishop of Municipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1955 Born
15 Feb 197519.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1981²25.3Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jan 198327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Nov 200954.2AppointedSuperior of Baku, Azerbaijan
4 Aug 201155.9AppointedPrefect of Azerbaijan
8 Dec 201762.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Municipa
11 Feb 201862.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Municipa

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vladimír Fekete
Father Vladimír Fekete S.D.B. (born ) Prefect of Azerbaijan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBratislava, Slovakia
Ordained PriestBerlin, Diocese of Berlin, Germany
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Immaculate Conception, Church, Baku, Prefecture Apostolic of Azerbaijan

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Azerbaijan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2009
  • ab/pref: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 103, Page 567, and Page 568
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2017
  • c1: CB, 8 Dec 2017
  • sole: CB, 11 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018