Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Gábriš

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Decoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1913Born
26 Jun 193824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
19 Feb 197359.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia
19 Feb 197359.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Decoriana
3 Mar 197359.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Decoriana
13 Nov 198773.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Julius Gábriš
Bishop Julius Gábriš (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Trnava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTesárske Mlynany

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast