Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dušan Spiridion Špiner

Priest

Titular See: (resigned rights and privileges of a bishop; remained a priest)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1950 Born
9 Jun 197323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
6 Oct 197929.6Ordained BishopBishop
9 Mar 199242.0ResignedBishop

MicroData Summary for Dušan Spiridion Špiner
Father Dušan Spiridion Špiner (born ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVydrník, Slovakia
Ordained BishopChrlice u Brna

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/c1+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,533
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,534

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018