Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Pobožný

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Rožňava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Neila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1890Born
4 Sep 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 194959.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rožňava, Slovakia
25 Jul 194959.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Neila
14 Aug 194959.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neila
9 Jun 1972³82.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Rožňava, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Pobožný
Bishop Robert Pobožný (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTisovec

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018