Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavel Mária Hnilica, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Rusadus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1921Born
29 Sep 195029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Jan 195129.7Ordained BishopBishop
13 May 196443.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusadus
8 Oct 200685.5DiedTitular Bishop of Rusadus

MicroData Summary for Pavel Mária Hnilica
Bishop Pavel Mária Hnilica S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Rusadus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnatin, Slovakia

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 55.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 1
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 14 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast