Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rožňava

Dioecesis Rosnaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vladimír Filo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 13 March 1776
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Košice
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovakia
  • Square Kilometers: 7,000 (2,703 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Biskupsky urad, nam. Banikov 20, post. schranka 127, SK-048 01 Roxnava, Slovenska Republika
  • Telephone: (058)7877.201; 7877.226
  • Fax: 7877.210

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
13 March 1776ErectedArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Rožňava (erected)
30 December 1977Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Rožňava (from Esztergom)
31 March 1995Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Rožňava (from Trnava)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949167,338313,69553.3%115211361,2302819288ap1951
1969206,924331,17462.5%818892,324817381ap1971
1980205,744356,90557.6%7412862,3921213887ap1981
1990183,533328,14455.9%7910892,062108087ap1991
1999171,620338,75050.7%94331271,3515313492ap2000
2000172,950341,10050.7%94371311,3205613893ap2001
2001173,644342,15950.7%83371201,447579894ap2002
2002197,737350,98156.3%82401221,6206412194ap2003
2003198,910351,83656.5%81441251,5916811494ap2004
2004199,175343,35258.0%96471431,3925311294ap2005
2010227,511390,17758.3%132211531,4872672111ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 7 Jul 2013