Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lajos Balás de Sipek

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1855Born
7 Jul 187923.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 190550.3AppointedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
21 Dec 190550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Sep 192065.0DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Lajos Balás de Sipek
Bishop Lajos Balás de Sipek (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBecske, Hungary

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018