Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Kheberich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš

Titular Bishop of Sabrata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1869BornNemecká Lupca [Német-Lipcse]
29 Jun 189222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
9 Dec 191546.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia
9 Dec 191546.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
20 Feb 191646.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata
29 Apr 195181.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Martin Kheberich:
Bishop Martin Kheberich (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013