Catholic-Hierarchy DC

József Cardinal Samassa

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1828Born
22 Jul 185223.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Jul 185223.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 187142.3SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
26 Jun 187142.7ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
30 Jul 187142.8Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
27 Aug 187142.9InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
18 Jun 187344.7SelectedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Jul 187344.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
11 Dec 190577.1Elevated to Cardinal
11 Dec 190577.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
20 Aug 191283.8DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Samassa (VIAF: 121454477)
József Cardinal Samassa (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranyos-Maróth
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017