Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György (Juraj) Császka (Čásky)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1826Born
23 Sep 185023.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 185023.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 187447.2SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
15 Jun 187447.5ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
19 Jul 187447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
2 Sep 187447.7InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
17 Dec 189165.0AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
11 Aug 190477.6DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György (Juraj) Császka (Čásky) (VIAF: 88631084)
Archbishop György (Juraj) Császka (Čásky) (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyitra Szerdahely, Slovakia
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 215, and Page 504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jul 2017