Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kalman Belopotoczky

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Austria, Military

Titular Bishop of Tricale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1845Born
14 Jun 186823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
16 Jun 189045.3AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
22 Jul 189045.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
5 Oct 189045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
1 Jun 191166.3ResignedBishop of Austria, Military
22 Dec 191469.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Austria, Military

MicroData Summary for Kalman Belopotoczky
Bishop Kalman Belopotoczky (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Austria, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRužomberok, Diocese of Spiš, Slovakia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Spiš, Diocese of Spiš, Slovakia

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017