Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wolfgang Radnai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

Titular Archbishop of Axomis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1848Born
13 Aug 187123.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Aug 187123.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 190153.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
16 Dec 190153.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
25 Jan 190253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
11 Jul 190456.2AppointedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
27 Sep 190456.5InstalledBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
16 Dec 192072.7ResignedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
16 Dec 192072.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Axomis
14 Oct 193587.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Radnai
Archbishop Wolfgang Radnai (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisjenö, Romania
Ordained BishopCentral Seminary, Chapel, Budapest

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 76
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,063
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,827
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast