Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Árpád István Hanauer

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1869BornPapa
26 Jul 189222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Veszprém, Hungary
9 Sep 191949.7AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Oct 191949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
15 Jan 194272.0DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Árpád István Hanauer:
Bishop Árpád István Hanauer (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013